Global Patent Index - EP 0912235 B1

EP 0912235 B1 2001-12-19 - APPARATUS FOR MIXING OF MEDIA

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR MIXING OF MEDIA

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM MISCHEN VON MEDIEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE MELANGE DE MILIEUX

Publication

EP 0912235 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96920081 A

Priority

SE 9600488 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/04 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 69618249 D1 20020131; DE 69618249 T2 20020814; EP 0912235 A1 19990506; EP 0912235 B1 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-04-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-04-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030416

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020620

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-12 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020412

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020411

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020409

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69618249 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010222

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981113

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB