Global patent index - EP 0912264 B1

EP 0912264 B1 2000-02-02 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE OF PRECISION STEEL TUBES

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE OF PRECISION STEEL TUBES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PRÄZISIONSSTAHLROHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR FABRIQUER DES TUBES DE PRECISION EN ACIER

Publication

EP 0912264 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97932754 A

Priority

  • DE 9701452 W
  • DE 19628714 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19628714C1] The invention relates to a process for the manufacture of precision steel tubes by cold forming of tube blanks, in particular in a plurality of forming stages, with or without an internal tool. A tube blank of interstitial-free steel (IF) is used as the starting material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 1/00; C21D 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 1/22 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/12 (2006.01); C22C 38/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/001 (2013.01); B21C 1/22 (2013.01); C22C 38/12 (2013.01); C22C 38/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19628714 C1 19971204; EP 0912264 A1 19990506; EP 0912264 B1 20000202; US 6290788 B1 20010918; WO 9801242 A1 19980115

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150704

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150704

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150704

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59701097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140730

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-03-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-09

2000-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990617

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981222

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT