Global Patent Index - EP 0912269 B1

EP 0912269 B1 2000-01-26 - PROCESS FOR FITTING COMPONENTS ROTATIONALLY FIXEDLY ON A SHAFT

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR FITTING COMPONENTS ROTATIONALLY FIXEDLY ON A SHAFT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM DREHFESTEN ANORDNEN VON TEILEN AUF EINER WELLE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR MONTER DES PIECES SUR UN ARBRE DE FA ON QU'ELLES SOIENT SOLIDAIRES DE CELUI-CI EN ROTATION

Publication

EP 0912269 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97927056 A

Priority

  • DE 19625555 A
  • EP 9702752 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19625555A1] In order to secure components (2) like cams, pinions, discs, etc., rotationally fixedly on a hollow shaft (1), it is proposed, after the fitting of components with a small clearance (3) on the shaft, to expand the shaft by passing an expanding ram (5) through it and thus produce at least a force fit between the shaft and the components. A particularly firm bond can be obtained if the drillings in the components have a contour into which the shaft material force outwards by the expanding ram is pressed. The shaft can be expanded in steps if a ram with a stepped increase in its effective diameter or several rams of increasing diameters is/are used. The increase of the traction force exerted on the ram (5) can be sensed and used as an indicator allowing to know if the fitting desired for the components (2) has been reached.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/84; B21D 39/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/06 (2006.01); B21D 53/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/845 (2013.01); B21D 39/06 (2013.01); B21K 1/063 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49293 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49776 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4994 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19625555 A1 19980102; DE 19625555 C2 19990805; BR 9709986 A 19990810; EP 0912269 A1 19990506; EP 0912269 B1 20000126; ES 2143869 T3 20000516; JP 2000512555 A 20000926; KR 20000022160 A 20000425; US 6125537 A 20001003; WO 9749511 A1 19971231

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090528

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090529

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090529

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090528

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090528

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080524

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143869 T3

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701073 20000302

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-11-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990527

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981208

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT