Global Patent Index - EP 0912274 B1

EP 0912274 B1 2000-10-11 - POURING TABLE DIE BLOCK POSITIONING DEVICE FOR AN UPHILL VERTICAL CONTINUOUS CASTING MACHINE

Title (en)

POURING TABLE DIE BLOCK POSITIONING DEVICE FOR AN UPHILL VERTICAL CONTINUOUS CASTING MACHINE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINER GIESSTISCH-EXTRUDIERDÜSE EINER MASCHINE FÜR VERTIKAL AUFSTEIGENDEN STRANGGUSS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE POSITIONNEMENT D'UN BLOC-FILIERE D'UNE TABLE DE COULEE D'UNE MACHINE DE COULEE CONTINUE VERTICALE ASCENDANTE

Publication

EP 0912274 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97933731 A

Priority

  • FR 9701299 W
  • FR 9608959 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9803288A1] A device for positioning the die block (5) of a pouring table (1) relative to a vertical withdrawal axis (X-X) in an uphill vertical continuous casting machine for casting tubes (T) is disclosed. The die block (5) of the machine is supplied by a liquid metal feed device (3) and engages same. The positioning device includes a retractable holder (15) in which the die block (5) is fixed, a movable frame (6) supporting the liquid metal feed device (3), means (18, 19) for positioning the holder (15) relative to the frame (6), locking members (21, 25) for locking the holder (15) and the frame (6) in their respective positions such that the holder (15), the frame (6) and the liquid metal feed device (3) form a unitary assembly, a base (40) arranged in a predetermined position relative to the vertical withdrawal axis (X-X) for supporting said unitary assembly, and alignment means (47, 60, 64) for aligning the axis (Y-Y) of the die block (5) with the vertical withdrawal axis (X-X).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/14; B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/041 (2006.01); B22D 11/14 (2006.01); B22D 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/041 (2013.01); B22D 11/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9803288 A1 19980129; AU 3698097 A 19980210; BR 9710484 A 19990817; CA 2259510 A1 19980129; CA 2259510 C 20010911; CN 1072063 C 20011003; CN 1225598 A 19990811; CO 4700497 A1 19981229; DE 69703293 D1 20001116; DE 69703293 T2 20010222; EG 21494 A 20011128; EP 0912274 A1 19990506; EP 0912274 B1 20001011; ES 2151288 T3 20001216; FR 2751249 A1 19980123; FR 2751249 B1 19980904; JP 2000515813 A 20001128; JP 3382954 B2 20030304; RU 2153953 C1 20000810; US 6247520 B1 20010619

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130712

2014-09-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140908

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130711

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130711

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69703293

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130711

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120713

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120704

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151288 T3

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703293 20001116

2000-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-10-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990713

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990118

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT