Global Patent Index - EP 0912275 B1

EP 0912275 B1 2000-10-18 - CLAMPING DEVICE FOR A POURING TABLE IN A MACHINE FOR THE CONTINUOUS VERTICAL CASTING OF CAST IRON PARTS, PARTICULARLY TUBES

Title (en)

CLAMPING DEVICE FOR A POURING TABLE IN A MACHINE FOR THE CONTINUOUS VERTICAL CASTING OF CAST IRON PARTS, PARTICULARLY TUBES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPANNEN EINER GIESSTISCHES EINER VERTIKAL- STRANGGIESSMASCHINE FÜR DAS GIESSEN VON ROHEISENWERKSTÜCKEN, INSBESONDEREN ROHREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE BRIDAGE D'UNE TABLE DE COULEE D'UNE MACHINE DE COULEE CONTINUE VERTICALE DE PIECES, EN PARTICULIER DE TUBES, EN FONTE

Publication

EP 0912275 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97933732 A

Priority

  • FR 9701300 W
  • FR 9608960 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9803289A1] A clamping device for a pouring table in a machine for the continuous vertical casting of cast iron parts, particularly tubes (T), along a vertical withdrawal axis (X-X) is disclosed. The device includes a die block (5) aligned with the vertical withdrawal axis (X-X), and a liquid metal feed device (3). Two seals (12A, 12B) are arranged between the outlet of the liquid metal feed device (3) and the inlet of the die block (5). The device further includes means (6, 15, 21) for urging the die block (5) towards the outlet of the device (3) with a constant force in a direction parallel to the vertical withdrawal axis (X-X), in order to clamp the seals (12A, 12B).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/14; B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/041 (2006.01); B22D 11/106 (2006.01); B22D 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/145 (2013.01); B22D 11/041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9803289 A1 19980129; AU 3698197 A 19980210; BR 9710481 A 19990817; CA 2259511 A1 19980129; CA 2259511 C 20010911; CN 1072064 C 20011003; CN 1225599 A 19990811; CO 4700496 A1 19981229; DE 69703354 D1 20001123; DE 69703354 T2 20010301; EG 21242 A 20010430; EP 0912275 A1 19990506; EP 0912275 B1 20001018; ES 2151289 T3 20001216; FR 2751250 A1 19980123; FR 2751250 B1 19980821; JP 2001507991 A 20010619; RU 2166406 C2 20010510; US 6192971 B1 20010227

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130712

2014-09-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140908

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130711

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130711

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-04-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69703354

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130711

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120713

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120704

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2151289

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703354

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-23

2000-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990802

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990118

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT