Global Patent Index - EP 0912302 B1

EP 0912302 B1 2000-04-19 - CONTOUR CUTTING MACHINE

Title (en)

CONTOUR CUTTING MACHINE

Title (de)

KONTURSCHNEIDMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A DECOUPER LES CONTOURS

Publication

EP 0912302 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97927137 A

Priority

  • DE 29610945 U
  • EP 9702916 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6199468B1] The contour cutting machine comprises an endless circulating bandknife (22) which is guided around bandknife pulleys (30-34). To allow adjustment of the cutting strand (23) in the Y-direction, the bandknife (22) forms two loops (28,36) merging into each other, one (36) of these two loops serving for length compensation. The bandknife pulley (30) arranged at the transition from the second loop (36) to the first loop (28) guides the bandknife (22) therearound at a looping angle of substantially 270° so that all of the bandknife pulleys (30-34) are contacted by the same surface of the bandknife (22). The bandknife (22) will always be bent in one direction only. By thus avoiding alternating bending directions, the lifespan of the bandknife (22) is lengthened.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 1/46; B26F 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/46 (2013.01); Y10T 83/707 (2015.04); Y10T 83/7226 (2015.04); Y10T 83/7264 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29610945 U1 19961121; AU 3172897 A 19980114; AU 713563 B2 19991202; DK 0912302 T3 20001204; EP 0912302 A1 19990506; EP 0912302 B1 20000419; ES 2148987 T3 20001016; JP 2000512562 A 20000926; JP 3996196 B2 20071024; TW 338016 B 19980811; US 6199468 B1 20010313; WO 9749530 A1 19971231

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170604

2017-06-28 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170604

2017-06-12 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20170605

2017-06-07 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170604

2017-06-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59701478

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148987 T3

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701478 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

1999-12-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CONTOUR CUTTING MACHINE

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990618

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981210

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL