Global Patent Index - EP 0912305 B1

EP 0912305 B1 2000-04-19 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR CASK WOOD PRODUCTION

Title (en)

METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR CASK WOOD PRODUCTION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON FASSDAUBEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION D'OBTENTION DE MERRAINS

Publication

EP 0912305 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97928384 A

Priority

  • FR 9608440 A
  • IB 9700817 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9800269A1] The invention discloses in particular a method for producing cask wood. It comprises the following steps: cutting a log into at least one bolt; arranging the bolt according to an initial location with respect to a display system; marking at least one medullary ray and one bolt grain; defining at least one marking surface; conforming the marking surface with the medullary rays and the grain; determining a sawing path, and for instance two parallel paths; and effecting the sawing of the bolt following each path.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27B 1/00; B27H 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 1/00 (2006.01); B27H 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27H 3/02 (2013.01); B27B 1/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9800269 A1 19980108; AT 191875 T 20000515; AU 3270197 A 19980121; DE 69701737 D1 20000525; DE 69701737 T2 20001123; EP 0912305 A1 19990506; EP 0912305 B1 20000419; ES 2148992 T3 20001016; FR 2750636 A1 19980109; FR 2750636 B1 19981113; HU 0104741 A2 20020429; HU 0104741 A3 20020528; PT 912305 E 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOISIN FREDERIC

- Effective date: 20040731

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2005-07-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050702

2005-03-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050103

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOISIN FREDERIC

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-01-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-03 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050103

2004-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030703

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-07-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-07-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-06-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030627

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030627

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030627

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030620

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020712

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020703

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148992 T3

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-07-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701737 20000525

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU PT

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19990122;SI PAYMENT 19990122

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191875 T 20000515

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990616

1999-06-16 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19990122;SI PAYMENT 19990122

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990122

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU PT