Global Patent Index - EP 0912306 B1

EP 0912306 B1 2001-05-09 - COMPACT MOTORIZED TABLE SAW

Title (en)

COMPACT MOTORIZED TABLE SAW

Title (de)

MOTORANGETRIEBENE TISCHSÄGE MIT NIEDRIGEM RAUMBEDARF

Title (fr)

SCIE D'ETABLI COMPACTE ET A MOTEUR

Publication

EP 0912306 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97931105 A

Priority

  • US 9710085 W
  • US 65520596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9746356A2] A saw (10) with a compact frame (12) that permits the cutting of large workpieces and that can be operated repeatedly without requiring manual activation of an on/off switch. A special pivoting support arm pivots outwardly away from a motor assembly (18) to allow the cutting of large workpieces while allowing the size of the saw to remain relatively compact and portable. An automatic power switch mechanism (28, 30) also is provided to automatically turn on the saw motor upon the placement of a workpiece adjacent to the saw blade (20). The saw table (14) can be slid beyond the frame (12) for the cutting of large workpieces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27B 5/29; B23D 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23D 47/02 (2006.01); B27B 5/29 (2006.01); B28D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9746356 A2 19971211; WO 9746356 A3 19980514; CA 2257317 A1 19971211; CA 2257317 C 20040316; DE 69704771 D1 20010613; DE 69704771 T2 20010823; DE 69730455 D1 20040930; DE 69730455 T2 20050915; EP 0912306 A2 19990506; EP 0912306 B1 20010509; EP 1029641 A1 20000823; EP 1029641 B1 20040825; JP 2000511836 A 20000912; JP 3989021 B2 20071010

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130609

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130609

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69704771

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130609

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704771 20010613

2001-05-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990518

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981207

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT