Global Patent Index - EP 0912348 B1

EP 0912348 B1 2000-05-10 - RECORDING MATERIAL FOR INKJET PRINTING

Title (en)

RECORDING MATERIAL FOR INKJET PRINTING

Title (de)

AUFZEICHNUNGSMATERIAL FÜR DAS TINTENSTRAHL-DRUCKVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

MATERIAU D'ENREGISTREMENT POUR IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE

Publication

EP 0912348 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97929310 A

Priority

  • DE 19628342 A
  • EP 9703424 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19628342A1] A recording material for the inkjet method with aqueous inks, comprising a substrate paper containing synthetic fibers and comprising a porous recording layer which is arranged on one main surface or both main surfaces of the substrate paper, can be converted into a film and has a basis weight of from 10 g/m<2> to 50 g/m<2>. After conversion of the coating into a film by means of heat, a print on this paper is suitable for outdoor applications and as security paper, owing to its high water resistance and light stability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/52 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01); D21H 13/08 (2006.01); D21H 13/14 (2006.01); D21H 13/24 (2006.01); D21H 13/26 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 13/26 (2013.01); B41M 5/508 (2013.01); B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B41M 7/0054 (2013.01); D21H 13/08 (2013.01); D21H 13/14 (2013.01); D21H 13/24 (2013.01); B41M 5/5218 (2013.01); B41M 5/5236 (2013.01); B41M 5/5254 (2013.01); B41M 5/5272 (2013.01); B41M 5/5281 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19628342 A1 19980115; DE 19628342 C2 19990304; AT 192699 T 20000515; EP 0912348 A1 19990506; EP 0912348 B1 20000510; WO 9802313 A1 19980122

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151029

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-03-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69701984

- Representative's name: FLEISCHER, ENGELS & PARTNER MBB, PATENTANWAELT, DE

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090701

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-10-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701984 20000615

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-05-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192699 T 20000515

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990712

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981219

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI