Global patent index - EP 0912399 B1

EP 0912399 B1 2000-05-03 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR STERILISING A WEB OF PACKAGING MATERIAL

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR STERILISING A WEB OF PACKAGING MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM STERILISIEREN EINER VERPACKUNGSMATERIALBAHN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR STERILISER UNE BANDE DE MATERIAU D'EMBALLAGE

Publication

EP 0912399 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97930345 A

Priority

  • DE 9701257 W
  • DE 19626705 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19626705A1] A device (11) for sterilising a web (12) of packaging material has two pairs of doctor blades (17 to 20) for saturated steam and a downstream U.V. irradiation device (25). By using saturated steam at a temperature between 120 and 180 DEG C, together with the U.V. irradiation device (25), it is possible to eliminate or destroy the germs on the web (12) of packaging material in the desired manner without using chemical sterilising substances.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 55/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/06 (2006.01); B65B 55/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/103 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19626705 A1 19980108; EP 0912399 A1 19990506; EP 0912399 B1 20000503; ES 2147008 T3 20000816; JP 2000513682 A 20001017; WO 9801343 A1 19980115

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-30 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2003-08-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-08-20 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20030224

2003-08-20 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20030224

2002-08-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020802

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020626

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020626

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020622

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020611

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HASSIA VERPACKUNGSMASCHINEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20010105

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2147008

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-07-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701596

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990714

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990203

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE