Global Patent Index - EP 0912403 B1

EP 0912403 B1 2000-08-09 - TUBULAR CARDBOARD SEALING SYSTEM, AND BOX AND BOX LID HAVING SUCH A SEALING SYSTEM

Title (en)

TUBULAR CARDBOARD SEALING SYSTEM, AND BOX AND BOX LID HAVING SUCH A SEALING SYSTEM

Title (de)

KARTON-ROHRABSCHLUSS, SOWIE DOSE UND DOSENDECKEL MIT EINEM SOLCHEN ROHRABSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

FERMETURE TUBULAIRE EN CARTON, AINSI QUE BOITE ET COUVERCLE COMPORTANT UNE TELLE FERMETURE

Publication

EP 0912403 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97929206 A

Priority

  • EP 97929206 A
  • EP 9703162 W
  • EP 96110000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9748609A1] The invention relates to a cardboard tubular casing (1, 2) which is closed to form a tubular sealing system having a cardboard sealing member (3, 4) with a sealing surface (3a, 4a) which is substantially in the plane sealing the tubular casing (1, 2). Only one contact surface (2c, 4c) of a collar (3b, 4b) of the sealing member (3, 4) is connected to a contact surface (1c, 2c) of the casing (1, 2). Connection is simplified by only using one collar (3b, 4b) of the sealing member (3, 4) without a bead but it is still sufficiently strong. The tubular sealing system, for boxes, which is flush with the end surface can also be in the form of a scattering diaphragm with at least one outlet (6) and optionally a cover lug (5). A box with said sealing member (4) can easily be sealed tightly with a cover (3) which can be positioned over the box and is preferably also in the form of a tubular sealing system according to the invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 51/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 3/12 (2006.01); B65D 51/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/18 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0018 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0087 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9748609 A1 19971224; AT 195292 T 20000815; AU 3339997 A 19980107; AU 726365 B2 20001102; CA 2257956 A1 19971224; CA 2257956 C 20060815; DE 59702154 D1 20000914; DK 0912403 T3 20001218; EP 0912403 A1 19990506; EP 0912403 B1 20000809; ES 2151283 T3 20001216; US 5901902 A 19990511; ZA 9705491 B 19980123

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090619

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090618

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090619

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090619

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090618

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090618

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090618

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-31 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090618

2010-02-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GRABHER WERNER

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080701

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080619

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151283 T3

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL & PARTNER AG PATENTBUERO

2000-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-11-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-11-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-10-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702154 20000914

2000-09-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195292 T 20000815

1999-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6B 65D 51/18 A

1999-09-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TUBULAR CARDBOARD SEALING SYSTEM, AND BOX AND BOX LID HAVING SUCH A SEALING SYSTEM

1999-08-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6B 65D 51/18 A

1999-08-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TUBULAR CARDBOARD SEALING SYSTEM, AND BOX AND BOX LID HAVING SUCH A SEALING SYSTEM

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990601

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981123

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE