Global patent index - EP 0912413 B1

EP 0912413 B1 2000-03-08 - PLASTIC STOP-COCK FOR LIQUID CONTAINERS

Title (en)

PLASTIC STOP-COCK FOR LIQUID CONTAINERS

Title (de)

KUNSTSTOFFHAHN FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

ROBINET EN PLASTIQUE POUR CONTENANT A LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 0912413 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97917987 A

Priority

  • CH 9700191 W
  • CH 149596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9748614A1] The proposed stop-cock has a hollow, elastic basic body (1) with an inlet orifice and an outlet orifice (4). It also comprises a valve element (7), which in its normal position closes the outlet opening (4). In a first design of the tap the stroke, whereby the valve element is withdrawn from the outlet orifice (4), is accomplished by squeezing the sides of the basic body. In a second design of the tap the stroke, whereby the valve element is pushed out of the outlet orifice, is achieved by squeezing the basic body from above and below. The valve element (7) is attached to the wall (5) of the basic body (1) by a rod-shaped shank (10). The corresponding attachment point is located opposite the centre of the outlet orifice (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/20; B65D 77/06; B67D 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/06 (2006.01); B67D 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 3/043 (2013.01); B65D 77/067 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9748614 A1 19971224; AT 190285 T 20000315; AU 2631097 A 19980107; AU 718270 B2 20000413; BR 9709783 A 19990810; CA 2258180 A1 19971224; CH 691262 A5 20010615; DE 59701229 D1 20000413; EP 0912413 A1 19990506; EP 0912413 B1 20000308; ES 2146093 T3 20000716; US 5785212 A 19980728; ZA 9705121 B 19971231

INPADOC legal status

2006-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050516

2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-05-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050516

2004-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040510

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040416

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-25 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

- Ref Legal Event Code: FC

2000-08-25 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RN

2000-08-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146093

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-08 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-05-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000515

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701229

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-13

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT

2000-03-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 190285

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990714

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981203

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT