Global Patent Index - EP 0912422 B1

EP 0912422 B1 2000-08-23 - LONG-LASTING PACKAGING FOR ANETHOLE-BASED BEVERAGE

Title (en)

LONG-LASTING PACKAGING FOR ANETHOLE-BASED BEVERAGE

Title (de)

LANGZEITBEHÄLTER FÜR EIN ANETHOLHALTIGES GETRÄNK

Title (fr)

CONDITIONNEMENT DE LONGUE DUREE POUR BOISSON A BASE D'ANETHOLE

Publication

EP 0912422 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97930555 A

Priority

  • FR 9701102 W
  • FR 9607742 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9749621A1] The invention discloses a long-lasting single layer or multilayer packaging containing an alcoholic or non-alcoholic anethole-based beverage, characterised in that the layer contacting said beverage is made of a methyl-acrylonitrile-butadiene acrylate terpolymer. It also discloses a method for limiting the degradation of an alcoholic or non-alcoholic anethole-based beverage, in particular weakly alcoholic or non-alcoholic beverages, characterised in that the said beverages are stored in a long-lasting single layer or multilayer packaging of which the layer contacting the said beverages is made of a methyl-acrylonitrile-butadiene acrylate terpolymer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/72; C08L 51/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/72 (2006.01); B65D 1/02 (2006.01); C08F 220/14 (2006.01); C08F 220/44 (2006.01); C08L 33/10 (2006.01); C08L 33/20 (2006.01); C08L 51/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/0207 (2013.01); B65D 85/72 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1352 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9749621 A1 19971231; AT 195700 T 20000915; AU 3446897 A 19980114; CA 2259451 A1 19971231; CA 2259451 C 20071211; DE 69702916 D1 20000928; DE 69702916 T2 20010329; DK 0912422 T3 20001218; EP 0912422 A1 19990506; EP 0912422 B1 20000823; ES 2150264 T3 20001116; FR 2750116 A1 19971226; FR 2750116 B1 19980911; GR 3034878 T3 20010228; JP 2000512602 A 20000926; PT 912422 E 20001229; US 5908678 A 19990601

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160310

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080620

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080619

2010-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2010-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090106

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080620

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080619

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080620

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080619

2009-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090107

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080619

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080619

2009-04-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-03-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080619

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080619

2009-02-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-02-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081219

2009-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-01-06 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20081219

2008-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PERNOD-RICARD

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070911

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-05 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070705

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-19 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070619

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-07-11 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-12-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150264 T3

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702916 20000928

2000-09-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: CON LOR S.R.L.

2000-09-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195700 T 20000915

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991110

1999-11-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LONG-LASTING PACKAGING FOR ANETHOLE-BASED BEVERAGE

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990111

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE