Global Patent Index - EP 0912470 B9

EP 0912470 B9 2002-09-25 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PURIFYING AND ENRICHING MOLECULES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PURIFYING AND ENRICHING MOLECULES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFREINIGUNG UND ANREICHERUNG VON MOLEKÜLEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PURIFICATION ET D'ENRICHISSEMENT DE MOLECULES

Publication

EP 0912470 B9 (DE)

Application

EP 97931688 A

Priority

  • DE 9701368 W
  • DE 19628171 A
  • DE 29702254 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6479644B1] The invention relates to a process for purifying and concentrating charge-bearing first molecules 9, such as proteins, nucleic acids and the like, comprising the following steps:a) preparation of a solution containing the first molecules 9,b) contacting the solution with an electrode 2 which is directly provided with a coating of second molecules 4 having affinity for the first molecules 9, andc) connecting the electrode 2 to a means 11 for generating an electric field to bring about a movement of the first molecules 9 in the solution directed relative to the electrode 2.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07B 63/00; C07H 1/06; C07H 19/20; C07H 21/00; C07K 1/14; C25B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/00 (2006.01); B03C 5/00 (2006.01); C07H 1/06 (2006.01); C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C07K 1/22 (2006.01); C07K 1/24 (2006.01); C07K 1/26 (2006.01); C12M 1/00 (2006.01); C12M 1/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 1/22 (2013.01); C07H 1/06 (2013.01); C07K 1/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6479644 B1 20021112; AT 213227 T 20020215; AU 3537697 A 19980209; AU 719533 B2 20000511; CA 2260132 A1 19980122; EP 0912470 A1 19990506; EP 0912470 B1 20020213; EP 0912470 B9 20020925; ES 2172801 T3 20021001; JP 2000515508 A 20001121; WO 9802399 A1 19980122

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080628

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080628

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2006-06-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050628

2004-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030630

2004-04-07 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030628

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NOVEMBER A.G. GESELLSCHAFT FUR MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172801 T3

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-06-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-06-27 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020627

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020621

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020620

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020617

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-05-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-05-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-05-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59706396 20020321

2002-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-02-13 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 213227 T 20020215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVEMBER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT GESELLSCHAFT FUER MOLE

2001-10-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERTLING, WOLF M., PROF. DR.

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010627

1999-06-25 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1999-06-16 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981224

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE