Global Patent Index - EP 0912722 A4

EP 0912722 A4 2001-12-05 - METHOD OF CONSTRUCTING VECTORS FOR HOMOLOGOUS RECOMBINATION DIRECTED MUTAGENESIS

Title (en)

METHOD OF CONSTRUCTING VECTORS FOR HOMOLOGOUS RECOMBINATION DIRECTED MUTAGENESIS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR KONSTRUKTION VON VEKTOREN ZUR HOMOLOGEN REKOMBINATION DURCH GERICHTETE MUTAGENESE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE SERVANT A CONSTRUIRE DES VECTEURS DE RECOMBINAISON HOMOLOGUE POUR UNE MUTAGENESE DIRIGEE

Publication

EP 0912722 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98908603 A

Priority

  • DE 19707012 A
  • US 9803243 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9837175A1] The present invention provides a novel vector system and thereby a novel method for the simplified construction of recombinant vectors for directed mutagenesis. Said vector system is used to modify the eukaryotic genome, particularly of embryonic stem cells, at precise and predefined loci by the means of homologous recombination. Furthermore, said system finds its usage in the generation of new strategies for gene therapy and in the generation of genetically modified higher eukaryotic organisms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 5/00; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/69

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/907 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9514769 A1 19950601 - UNIV SOUTH FLORIDA [US]
  • [Y] NEHLS M ET AL: "Two large insert vectors, lambda PS and lambda KO, facilitate rapid mapping and targeted disruption of mammalian genes", BIOTECHNIQUES, vol. 17, no. 4, October 1994 (1994-10-01), pages 770 - 775, XP002179274
  • [DY] STORCK T ET AL: "Rapid construction in yeast of complex targeting vectors for gene manipulation in the mouse", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH., vol. 24, no. 22, 15 November 1996 (1996-11-15), pages 4594 - 4596, XP002076777
  • [PX] TSUZUKI T ET AL: "Embryonic stem cell gene targeting using bacteriophage lambda vectors generated by phage-plasmid recombination", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH., vol. 26, no. 4, 15 February 1998 (1998-02-15), pages 988 - 993, XP002179275
  • [T] WATTLER S ET AL: "Construction of gene targeting vectors from lambda KOS genomic libraries", BIOTECHNIQUES, vol. 26, no. 6, June 1999 (1999-06-01), pages 1150-1156, 1158, 1160, XP002179272
  • See also references of WO 9837175A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9837175 A1 19980827; EP 0912722 A1 19990506; EP 0912722 A4 20011205; JP 2002514072 A 20020514

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060908

2006-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/00 20060101AFI20060410BHEP

2006-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/66 20060101ALI20060410BHEP

2006-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/90 20060101ALI20060410BHEP

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040128

2001-12-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011023

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 5/00 A, 7C 12N 15/00 B, 7C 12N 15/69 B

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981023

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE