Global Patent Index - EP 0912725 A4

EP 0912725 A4 2001-03-14 - GLYCOSIDASE ENZYMES

Title (en)

GLYCOSIDASE ENZYMES

Title (de)

GLYKOSIDASEENZYME

Title (fr)

ENZYMES DE TYPE GLYCOSIDASE

Publication

EP 0912725 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97906876 A

Priority

  • US 9700092 W
  • US 58378796 A
  • US 71261296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9725417A1] A thermostable glycosidase enzymes derived from various thermococcus, staphylothermus and pyrococcus organisms is disclosed. The enzymes are produced from native or recombinant host cells and can be utilized in the food processing industry, pharmaceutical industry and in the textile industry, detergent industry and in the baking industry.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 9/26; C07H 21/04; C12N 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/24 (2006.01); C12N 9/26 (2006.01); C12N 9/38 (2006.01); C12N 9/40 (2006.01); C12N 9/44 (2006.01); C12P 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/2457 (2013.01); C12N 9/2402 (2013.01); C12N 9/2451 (2013.01); C12N 9/2468 (2013.01); C12N 9/2471 (2013.01); C12N 9/2494 (2013.01); C12Y 302/01022 (2013.01); C12Y 302/01023 (2013.01); C12Y 302/01025 (2013.01); C12Y 302/01041 (2013.01); C12Y 302/01078 (2013.01); C12Y 302/0115 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0606008 A2 19940713 - TAKARA SHUZO CO [JP]
  • [X] EP 0687732 A1 19951220 - TAKARA SHUZO CO [JP]
  • [E] WO 9824799 A1 19980611 - DIVERSA CORP [US], et al
  • [E] WO 9725417 A1 19970717 - RECOMBINANT BIOCATALYSIS INC [US]
  • [E] WO 9744361 A1 19971127 - RECOMBINANT BIOCATALYSIS INC [US], et al
  • [E] WO 9720918 A1 19970612 - RECOMBINANT BIOCATALYSIS INC [US]
  • [X] DAKHOVA O N ET AL: "CLONING AND EXPRESSION IN ESCHERICHIA COLI OF THERMOTOGA NEAPOLITANA GENES CODING FOR ENZYMES OF CARBOHYDRATE SUBSTRATE DEGRADATION", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS,US,ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, vol. 194, no. 3, 16 August 1993 (1993-08-16), pages 1359 - 1364, XP002026991, ISSN: 0006-291X & DAKHOVA ET AL.: "Thermotoga neapolitana bgA1 gene", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, 1 July 1997 (1997-07-01), HEIDELBERG DE, XP002154622DAKHOVA ET AL.Thermotoga neapolitana bgA1 geneEMBL SEQUENCE DATABASEHEIDELBERG DE19970701 & DAKHOVA ET AL.: "T. neapolitana lamA gene and bg1B gene", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, 31 December 1995 (1995-12-31), HEIDELBERG DE, XP002154623DAKHOVA ET AL.T. neapolitana lamA gene and bg1B geneEMBL SEQUENCE DATABASEHEIDELBERG DE19951231
  • [A] VOORHORST W G B ET AL: "CHARACTERIZATION OF THE CELB GENE CODING FOR BETA-GLUCOSIDASE FROM THE HYPERTHERMOPHILIC ARCHAEON PYROCOCCUS FURIOSUS AND ITS EXPRESSION AND SITE-DIRECTED MUTATION IN ESCHERICHIA COLI", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY,US,WASHINGTON, DC, vol. 177, no. 24, 1 December 1995 (1995-12-01), pages 7105 - 7111, XP002064570, ISSN: 0021-9193
  • [A] GRAEBNITZ F ET AL: "STRUCTURE OF THE BETA-GLUCOSIDASE GENE BGLA OF CLOSTRIDIUM THERMOCELLUM. SEQUENCE ANALYSIS REVEALS A SUPERFAMILY OF CELLULASES AND BETA-GLYCOSIDASES INCLUDING HUMAN LACTASE/PHLORIZIN HYDROLASE", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY,DE,BERLIN, vol. 200, no. 2, 1 September 1991 (1991-09-01), pages 301 - 309, XP000874574, ISSN: 0014-2956
  • [A] CANGANELLA F ET AL: "CHARACTERIZATION OF AMYLOLYTIC AND PULLULYTIC ENZYMES FROM THERMOPHILIC ARCHAEA AND FROM A NEW FERVIDOBACTERIUM SPECIES", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY,DE,SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, vol. 42, no. 2/03, 1994, pages 239 - 245, XP000602919, ISSN: 0175-7598
  • [PX] BAUER ET AL.: "Comparison of a beta-glucosidase and a beta-mannosidase from hyperthermophilic archaeon Pyrococcus furiosus", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 271, no. 39, 27 September 1996 (1996-09-27), pages 23749 - 23755, XP002154624 & BAUER ET AL.: "Pyrococcus furiosus beta mannosidase (bmnA) gene, complete ccds", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, 2 July 1996 (1996-07-02), HEIDELBERG DE, XP002154625BAUER ET AL.Pyrococcus furiosus beta mannosidase (bmnA) gene, complete ccdsEMBL SEQUENCE DATABASEHEIDELBERG DE19960702 & BAUER ET AL.: "Beta-mannosidase", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, 1 November 1996 (1996-11-01), HEIDELBERG DE, XP002154626BAUER ET AL.Beta-mannosidaseEMBL SEQUENCE DATABASEHEIDELBERG DE19961101
  • See also references of WO 9725417A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9725417 A1 19970717; AT 271126 T 20040715; AU 2241097 A 19970801; AU 726017 B2 20001026; AU 726017 C 20060914; CA 2242767 A1 19970717; CA 2242767 C 20060530; DE 69729870 D1 20040819; DE 69729870 T2 20060302; DE 69738631 D1 20080521; EP 0912725 A1 19990506; EP 0912725 A4 20010314; EP 0912725 B1 20040714; ES 2225954 T3 20050316; JP 2002509425 A 20020326; JP 2004000189 A 20040108

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120111

2013-07-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130708

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110216

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090110

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2010-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090112

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090110

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090110

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-10-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090110

2009-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080206

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-08-22 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-08-22 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080229

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-06-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: VERENIUM CORPORATION

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041214

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DIVERSA CORPORATION

- Free text: DIVERSA CORPORATION#4955 DIRECTORS PLACE,#SAN DIEGO, CA 92121 (US) -TRANSFER TO- DIVERSA CORPORATION#4955 DIRECTORS PLACE,#SAN DIEGO, CA 92121 (US)

2005-11-01 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-05-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225954 T3

2005-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050110

2005-01-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: DIVERSA CORPORATION

2004-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DIVERSA CORPORATION

2004-10-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-10-14 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-10-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69729870 P 20040819

2004-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-07-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-03-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010123

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980811

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE