Global Patent Index - EP 0912781 B1

EP 0912781 B1 2001-02-28 - ROVING FRAME WITH A DEVICE ENABLING FULL ROVING BOBBINS TO BE REPLACED AUTOMATICALLY BY EMPTY ROVING BOBBINS

Title (en)

ROVING FRAME WITH A DEVICE ENABLING FULL ROVING BOBBINS TO BE REPLACED AUTOMATICALLY BY EMPTY ROVING BOBBINS

Title (de)

VORSPINNMASCHINE MIT EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUM SELBSTTÄTIGEN AUSWECHSELN VOLLER VORGARNSPULEN GEGEN LEERE VORGARNHÜLSEN

Title (fr)

BANC A BROCHES MUNI D'UN DISPOSITIF POUR L'ECHANGE AUTOMATIQUE DE BOBINES DE BANC PLEINES CONTRE DES CANNETTES VIDES

Publication

EP 0912781 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97946729 A

Priority

  • DE 9702370 W
  • DE 19643655 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19643655A1] The invention relates to a roving frame with a device enabling roving bobbins (12) located on a copping rail (4) to be replaced automatically by empty roving bobbins (13), comprising at least one guide track (5) for a suspended carriage assembly (10) moving inwards and outwards, perpendicular to the longitudinal direction of the roving frame, in an area of front and rear rows of flyers located on a flyer rail (3), and a changeover area with suspended holders where full roving bobbins (12) or empty roving bobbins can be hung in the area of an operating position with a view to automatic replacement. The carriage assembly can travel in the guide tracks between the front and the rear rows of flyers, and the copping rail (4) can be moved relatively sideways with regard to the carriage assembly (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 9/04; D01H 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/04 (2006.01); D01H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19643655 A1 19980423; DE 19643655 C2 20000525; CN 1080333 C 20020306; CN 1206439 A 19990127; EP 0912781 A1 19990506; EP 0912781 B1 20010228; ES 2155265 T3 20010501; IT 1294722 B1 19990412; IT MI972027 A1 19990305; JP 2000502414 A 20000229; US 6038846 A 20000321; WO 9817849 A1 19980430

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081015

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-03-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110302

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081014

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071030

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071030

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2005-10-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051020

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155265 T3

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703065 20010405

2001-03-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000628

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980610

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI