Global Patent Index - EP 0912791 B1

EP 0912791 B1 2000-10-11 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR UNLOADING ITEMS OF WASHING FROM A TREATMENT MACHINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR UNLOADING ITEMS OF WASHING FROM A TREATMENT MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM ENTLADEN VON WÄSCHESTÜCKEN AUS EINER BEARBEITUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SORTIR DU LINGE D'UNE MACHINE DE TRAITEMENT

Publication

EP 0912791 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97927167 A

Priority

  • DE 19625707 A
  • EP 9703017 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19625707A1] The invention concerns a method and device for unloading items of washing (39) from a treatment machine (such as a spin-drier, washer-drier, tumble drier, separator, washing machine) which has a perforated drum (21) and a drum casing (22) with an opening (26) at the front for unloading which can be closed with a door (27) wherein after the end of the cycle the drum (21) is rotated at a certain number of revolutions/min which is less than the number of spinning revolutions/min and yet is high enough so that for a predetermined weight the centrifugal forces affecting the items of washing (39.1) are greater than the force of gravity. The door (27) of the drum casing (22) is opened, the pipe (38) of a suction delivery system (37) is attached to the opening (26) in the drum casing (22) and the suction delivery system (37) is activated. The mechanism (29) for sealing an opening through which air is admitted (28) and which is attached to the peripheral wall of the drum casing (22) can be opened intermittently or continually to a varying extent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 95/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/00 (2006.01); B65G 51/02 (2006.01); D06F 39/12 (2006.01); D06F 49/02 (2006.01); D06F 95/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 95/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19625707 A1 19980108; AT 196934 T 20001015; EP 0912791 A1 19990506; EP 0912791 B1 20001011; ES 2153670 T3 20010301; JP 3131159 B2 20010131; JP H1033900 A 19980210; US 6094763 A 20000801; WO 9800598 A1 19980108

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702463

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150610

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150610

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150616

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150101

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140528

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110611

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20121116

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 196934 T

- Effective date: 20110610

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110610

2012-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ENGEL GERHARD

- Effective date: 20110630

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100629

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100630

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100629

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100517

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153670 T3

2001-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010105

2001-01-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702463 20001116

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196934 T 20001015

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000323

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981027

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL