Global Patent Index - EP 0912807 B1

EP 0912807 B1 2001-03-14 - WALL CONSTRUCTION

Title (en)

WALL CONSTRUCTION

Title (de)

WANDAUFBAU

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE DE MUR

Publication

EP 0912807 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97933971 A

Priority

  • SE 9701294 W
  • SE 9602804 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9803745A1] This invention relates to an outer wall, intended for buildings, preferably dwelling houses, the wall comprising an outer portion, an intermediate portion comprising insulating material and an inner portion. According to the invention the outer wall is characterized in that the intermediate portion (2) on that part, which is directed to the outer portion (1) and on that part, which is directed to the inner portion (3), has a cardboard material (5, 6), which is made in such a way that it can allow air to pass through, and that the insulating material comprises an organic material, preferably sawdust or the like, with the quality to be able to receive and emit moisture while maintaining its insulating ability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/70 (2006.01); E04B 1/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/7069 (2013.01); E04B 1/7604 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9803745 A1 19980129; AT 199758 T 20010315; AU 3714297 A 19980210; DE 69704275 D1 20010419; DE 69704275 T2 20011011; EP 0912807 A1 19990506; EP 0912807 B1 20010314; SE 9602804 D0 19960718

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-07-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-01-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050718

2005-07-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2004-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040729

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040714

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-08-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-06-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704275 20010419

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI LI NL SE

2001-03-14 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199758 T 20010315

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000119

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990216

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI LI NL SE