Global Patent Index - EP 0912813 B1

EP 0912813 B1 2000-12-13 - SAFETY DOOR ASSEMBLY, IN PARTICULAR A STERILE DOOR

Title (en)

SAFETY DOOR ASSEMBLY, IN PARTICULAR A STERILE DOOR

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSTÜR, INSBESONDERE STERILTÜR

Title (fr)

PORTE DE SECURITE, NOTAMMENT PORTE STERILE

Publication

EP 0912813 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97937488 A

Priority

  • DE 19628747 A
  • EP 9703787 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19628747A1] The invention concerns a safety door assembly (1) for delimiting safety rooms and sterile rooms, the door assembly having a door frame (2) and a single-leaf door (3). The door leaf (3) carries at its edge, facing the frame (2), a peripheral hose-type seal (8) of rubber of plastics which forms part of the sealing system (5), is sealingly connected to the door leaf (3) and can be inflated with a predetermined sealing force against an autogenic restoring force. The frame surface facing the door leaf (3) takes the form of a flat, non-deformable sealing counterface (7), against which the inflated hose-type seal (6) is sealingly supported when the door leaf (3) is closed and the sealing system (5) switched on. The sealing system (5) is automatically controlled and arranged such that the sealing force additionally locks the closed door leaf (3) securely against the frame (2) via frictional engagement and is unlocked in a pressure-relief time interval of a few seconds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/2318 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 7525876 U 19760129

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19628747 A1 19980129; DE 19628747 C2 20001130; AT 198094 T 20001215; CA 2236536 A1 19980129; CA 2236536 C 20050104; CZ 295638 B6 20050914; CZ 9804275 A3 19991117; EP 0912813 A1 19990506; EP 0912813 B1 20001213; ES 2152696 T3 20010201; HU 221070 B1 20020729; HU 9902178 A2 19991129; HU 9902178 A3 20000128; JP 2000514516 A 20001031; JP 3955098 B2 20070808; PL 184621 B1 20021129; PL 329370 A1 19990329; US 6195941 B1 20010306; WO 9803761 A1 19980129

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702764

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702764

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ABBOTT LABORATORIES GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SOLVAY PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH, 30173 HANNOVER, DE

- Document: DE 59702764

- Effective date: 20130219

2013-04-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ABBOTT LABORATORIES GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ABBOT PRODUCTS GMBH, 30173 HANNOVER, DE

- Document: DE 59702764

- Effective date: 20130311

2013-04-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702764

- Representative's name: HONKE UND KOLLEGEN, DE

- Effective date: 20130311

2013-04-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702764

- Representative's name: HONKE UND KOLLEGEN, DE

- Effective date: 20130219

2010-07-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080716

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080716

2009-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080716

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080715

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080715

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080715

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080715

2009-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080715

2009-03-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070817

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070723

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070723

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070723

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070725

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070727

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050709

2005-08-31 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20050709

2002-01-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SOMMER METALLBAU STAHLBAU GMBH & CO. KG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SOMMER METALLBAU STAHLBAU GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152696 T3

2001-01-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2001-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702764 20010118

2001-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198094 T 20001215

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOLVAY PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH

2000-04-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000306

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980430

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE