Global Patent Index - EP 0912816 B1

EP 0912816 B1 2001-12-12 - CUTTING CONTROL PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE DEPTH OF CUT OF KIRVING TOOLS

Title (en)

CUTTING CONTROL PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE DEPTH OF CUT OF KIRVING TOOLS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN DES SCHNEIDPROZESSES UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG DER EINBRUCHSTIEFE VON SCHRÄMWERKZEUGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR COMMANDER LE PROCESSUS DE COUPE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETECTER LA PROFONDEUR DE PENETRATION D'OUTILS DE HAVAGE

Publication

EP 0912816 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97929020 A

Priority

  • AT 9700159 W
  • AT 129696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9803770A1] In a cutting control process for kirving tools (6) on advance working machines (2), the depth of cut of the kirving tool (6) is detected and the measurement data for the depth of cut are linked to a control unit in which the geometry of the winning tool is stored and measurement data for load-bearing capacity are taken into account. To carry out the process a device is provided for detecting the depth of cut of kirving tools (6) of advance working machines (2) into the rock face, said device comprising in the forward region of the advance working machine (2) at least one proximity sensor (7) directed to the rock face and connected to an evaluation unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21C 35/24; E21C 27/24; E21D 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21C 27/24 (2006.01); E21C 35/24 (2006.01); E21D 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21C 27/24 (2013.01); E21C 35/24 (2013.01); E21D 9/108 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9803770 A1 19980129; AT 210782 T 20011215; AT 406892 B 20001025; AT A129696 A 20000215; AU 3328697 A 19980210; AU 722290 B2 20000727; DE 59705784 D1 20020124; EP 0912816 A1 19990506; EP 0912816 B1 20011212; ES 2134181 T1 19991001

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705784

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705784

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080709

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070716

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705784 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-12-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210782 T 20011215

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010316

2000-03-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOEST-ALPINE BERGTECHNIK GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H

1999-10-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2134181 T1

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990120

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI