Global Patent Index - EP 0912830 A4

EP 0912830 A4 2000-02-23 - DOUBLE ACTING PNEUMATICALLY DRIVEN ROLLING DIAPHRAGM PUMP

Title (en)

DOUBLE ACTING PNEUMATICALLY DRIVEN ROLLING DIAPHRAGM PUMP

Title (de)

DOPPELWIRKENDE PNEUMATISCH ANGETRIEBENE ROLLMEMBRANPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE A PISTON A COMMANDE PNEUMATIQUE ET MEMBRANE A ENROULEMENT

Publication

EP 0912830 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97932611 A

Priority

  • US 9712338 W
  • US 68352896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9802659A1] A reciprocating pump includes a housing (12) having an annular passage extending therethrough between opposed open ends, and a piston (22) is disposed within the annular passage between glands positioned at each open end. A pressurizing chamber assembly is disposed at each housing end and includes a chamber head that is attached to respective housing ends. A pressurizing member is disposed within each chamber head and is attached to respective opposite ends of the piston. The pressurizing member, and an inside surface of a respective chamber head, form a pressurizing chamber therebetween. The pressurizing member is of a one-piece construction, having a solid nose portion (18) and a hollow skirt (104). The hollow skirt has a flanged end that is interposed between a respective chamber head and housing end to form an air- and liquid-tight seal therebetween.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 17/00; F01B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 9/105 (2006.01); F04B 9/113 (2006.01); F04B 43/00 (2006.01); F04B 43/02 (2006.01); F04B 43/06 (2006.01); F04B 43/073 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 53/164 (2013.01); F04B 43/0054 (2013.01); F04B 43/0063 (2013.01); F04B 43/026 (2013.01); F04B 43/0736 (2013.01); F04B 2201/0201 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9802659 A1 19980122; AT 278106 T 20041015; AU 3601997 A 19980209; DE 69730964 D1 20041104; DE 69730964 T2 20051006; EP 0912830 A1 19990506; EP 0912830 A4 20000223; EP 0912830 B1 20040929; JP 2000514525 A 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070715

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070715

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070715

2006-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060717

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN PERFORMANCE PLASTICS CORPORATION

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69730964 P 20041104

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020228

2000-02-23 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990112

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB