Global Patent Index - EP 0912860 B1

EP 0912860 B1 2000-10-04 - RECESSED LUMINAIRE WITH RETAINING MEANS FOR RETAINING IT IN A MOUNTING BODY OR RETAINING MEANS FOR SUCH A RECESSED LUMINAIRE

Title (en)

RECESSED LUMINAIRE WITH RETAINING MEANS FOR RETAINING IT IN A MOUNTING BODY OR RETAINING MEANS FOR SUCH A RECESSED LUMINAIRE

Title (de)

EINBAULEUCHTE MIT HALTEMITTELN ZU IHRER HALTERUNG IN EINEM EINBAUKÖRPER ODER HALTEMITTEL FÜR EINE SOLCHE EINBAULEUCHTE

Title (fr)

LUMINAIRE ENCASTRE COMPORTANT DES MOYENS DE RETENUE POUR SA FIXATION DANS UN CORPS DE FIXATION, OU MOYENS DE RETENUE POUR UN TEL LUMINAIRE

Publication

EP 0912860 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97931756 A

Priority

  • DE 19629901 A
  • EP 9703503 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19629901A1] A recessed luminaire (1) has a base (2) and retaining means (5) for retaining the recessed luminaire (1) in a mounting body (7) that are connected to the base (2), the retaining means (5) for the recessed luminaire (1) each having a support leg (24b) on which a retaining member (26) extending sideways is held in a guideway (27) so that it can be adjusted, and fixed in its respective position of adjustment; a push rod (29) extending downwards from the retaining member (26) is provided for adjusting the retaining member (26). The push rod (29) can be adjusted from its downwards-directed service position to a non-service position that can be moved upwards. An arresting device (28) for the retaining member (26) is provided in the guideway (27) between the push rod (29) and the retaining member (26); this arrests the retaining member (26) in the guideway (27) when the push rod (29) is shifted into its non-service position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19629901 A1 19980129; AT 196796 T 20001015; AU 3540597 A 19980220; EP 0912860 A1 19990506; EP 0912860 B1 20001004; NO 321200 B1 20060403; NO 990280 A 19990122; NO 990280 D0 19990122; WO 9804868 A1 19980205

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ZUMTOBEL STAFF G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030703

2002-09-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020927

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020726

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020723

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020722

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020717

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-04-04 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001004

2001-03-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-01-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010104

2001-01-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010104

2000-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702431 20001109

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-10-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196796 T 20001015

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000113

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981117

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE