Global Patent Index - EP 0912861 B1

EP 0912861 B1 2000-11-29 - ADAPTER FOR A RETAINING MEANS USED TO SECURE A BUILT-IN LAMP IN A MOUNTING HOLE, OR RETAINING MEANS OR BUILT-IN LAMP PROVIDED WITH SUCH AN ADAPTER

Title (en)

ADAPTER FOR A RETAINING MEANS USED TO SECURE A BUILT-IN LAMP IN A MOUNTING HOLE, OR RETAINING MEANS OR BUILT-IN LAMP PROVIDED WITH SUCH AN ADAPTER

Title (de)

ADAPTER FÜR EIN HALTEMITTEL, WELCHES ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINER EINBAULEUCHTE IN EINER EINBAUÖFFNUNG BESTIMMT IST, ODER HALTEMITTEL ODER EINBAULEUCHTE MIT EINEM SOLCHEN ADAPTER

Title (fr)

ADAPTATEUR DESTINE A UN MOYEN DE RETENUE SERVANT A ASSUJETTIR DANS UN TROU DE FIXATION UN LUMINAIRE ENCASTRE, OU BIEN MOYEN DE RETENUE OU LUMINAIRE ENCASTRE POURVU D'UN TEL ADAPTATEUR

Publication

EP 0912861 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97936655 A

Priority

  • DE 19629901 A
  • DE 19642936 A
  • DE 19713818 A
  • EP 9704038 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9803818A1] An adapter (71) is disclosed for a retaining means (5) used to secure a built-in lamp (1) in a mounting hole (5) in a ceiling (7). The retaining means (5) is linked to the built-in lamp (1) and is designed with a supporting section (26) for bridging a mounting gap and supporting the lamp on the edge of the mounting hole (6). The adapter (71) may be joined to the retaining means (5) and has a gap reducing part (73a) to reduce the mounting gap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9803818 A1 19980129; AT 197842 T 20001215; AU 3940897 A 19980210; EP 0912861 A1 19990506; EP 0912861 B1 20001129

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ZUMTOBEL STAFF G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030724

2002-09-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020927

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020726

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020723

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020722

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020717

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-04-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702692 20010104

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197842 T 20001215

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991005

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991005

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981027

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE