Global Patent Index - EP 0912869 B1

EP 0912869 B1 2002-11-20 - FLAT TUBE HEAT EXCHANGER WITH MORE THAN TWO FLOWS AND A DEFLECTING BOTTOM FOR MOTOR VEHICLES, AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (en)

FLAT TUBE HEAT EXCHANGER WITH MORE THAN TWO FLOWS AND A DEFLECTING BOTTOM FOR MOTOR VEHICLES, AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (de)

MEHR ALS ZWEIFLUTIGER FLACHROHRWÄRMETAUSCHER FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE MIT UMLENKBODEN SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR A TUBES APLATIS AVEC DEUX FLUX OU DAVANTAGE ET UN FOND DE DEVIATION POUR VEHICULES A MOTEUR, AINSI QUE SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0912869 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925532 A

Priority

  • DE 19719256 A
  • EP 9802637 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19719256A1] A flat tube heat exchanger for motor vehicles has two or more flows and a deflecting bottom for deflecting adjacent flows (12) of the flat tubes. According to the invention, the deflecting bottom is subdivided into deflecting cups (20) individually associated to each flat tube (2) and interconnected only via their connection to their corresponding flat tubes (2). Also disclosed is a process for manufacturing such a flat tube heat exchanger by drawing, straightening and cutting flat tubes into sections from a coil, mechanically pre-assembling the flat tube heat exchanger from its component parts, including the flat tubes, and welding. The deflecting cups (20) are mechanically pre-assembled together with the flat tubes, after they are cut into sections and before the flat tube heat exchanger is pre-assembled together with the flat tubes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/26; F28D 1/053

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/05391 (2013.01); F28F 9/262 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19719256 A1 19981112; DE 19719256 B4 20050818; BR 9804890 A 19990831; CN 1228158 A 19990908; EP 0912869 A1 19990506; EP 0912869 B1 20021120; US 6315037 B1 20011113; WO 9850750 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010228

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990122

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR