Global Patent Index - EP 0912873 B1

EP 0912873 B1 2000-12-06 - GUN WITH DETACHABLE BARREL MOUNTING

Title (en)

GUN WITH DETACHABLE BARREL MOUNTING

Title (de)

GEWEHR MIT LÖSBARER LAUFBEFESTIGUNG

Title (fr)

FUSIL A FIXATION DE CANON AMOVIBLE

Publication

EP 0912873 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97930251 A

Priority

  • AT 9700166 W
  • AT 127796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9802707A1] The invention relates to a gun with a barrel detachably mounted in the housing in such a manner that between the rear section of the barrel (5) and the inner cylindrical surface (3) of the housing (1), pairs of straining rings (11, 12) with opposing conical surfaces are provided which are pressed by a tensioning nut (13) axially against a collar (7) of the barrel (5). Said barrel mounting can also be used for a housing of light metal, for simple production and eliminating misalignment and tolerances caused by manufacture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 21/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 21/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 21/487 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9802707 A1 19980122; AT 197991 T 20001215; DE 59702731 D1 20010111; EP 0912873 A1 19990506; EP 0912873 B1 20001206; US 6205696 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-03-07 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-03-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-01-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59702731

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131128

2014-01-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59702731

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: V. FUENER EBBINGHAUS FINCK HANO, DE

- Effective date: 20131128

2013-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL AND PARTN, CH

2013-12-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-08-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-04-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2003-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ANDRE ROLAND CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INTELLECTUELLE

2003-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2003-10-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20031009

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20001206

2001-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702731

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-11

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-12-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197991

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-11-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000331

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981216

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI