Global patent index - EP 0912916 B1

EP 0912916 B1 2000-03-15 - METHOD FOR PRINTING ON A PORTABLE DATA MEDIUM, PARTICULARLY A SMART CARD, AND RESULTING PRINTED DATA MEDIUM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRINTING ON A PORTABLE DATA MEDIUM, PARTICULARLY A SMART CARD, AND RESULTING PRINTED DATA MEDIUM

Title (de)

DRUCKVERFAHREN FÜR EINE SCHICHT EINES TRAGBAREN DATENTRÄGERS, INSBESONDERE EINER SPEICHERKARTE UND NACH DIESEM VERFAHREN BEDRUCKTER DATENTRÄGER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION D'UNE COUCHE D'UN CORPS DE SUPPORT PORTABLE, NOTAMMENT CARTE A MEMOIRE, ET CORPS DE SUPPORT IMPRIME SELON UN TEL PROCEDE

Publication

EP 0912916 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97928333 A

Priority

  • FR 9701044 W
  • FR 9607240 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9748016A1] A method for printing on an exposed polymerised thermoplastic or curable layer of the body of a portable data medium, and a portable data medium, particularly a chip card, comprising a polymerised layer, are disclosed. The method comprises the steps of mixing a polymerisable thermoplastic or curable binder and at least one light-sensitive compound responsive to laser radiation having a predetermined wavelength in such a way that it changes from a first state to a second coloured state, in order to form a mixture; exposing the mixture to the laser radiation having a predetermined wavelength; and polymerising the mixture to form the polymerised layer of the body of the data medium. The method is particularly suitable for printing on smart cards.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 5/56; B41M 3/14; B41M 5/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 19/077 (2006.01); B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B41M 5/28 (2006.01); B42D 15/10 (2006.01); G03C 1/00 (2006.01); G03C 5/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/142 (2013.01); B41M 5/284 (2013.01); G03C 5/56 (2013.01); Y10S 430/146 (2013.01); Y10S 430/163 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9748016 A1 19971218; AT 190735 T 20000415; BR 9709705 A 19990810; CA 2268786 A1 19971218; CN 1179242 C 20041208; CN 1227636 A 19990901; DE 69701468 D1 20000420; DE 69701468 T2 20000810; EP 0912916 A1 19990506; EP 0912916 B1 20000315; ES 2147003 T3 20000816; FR 2749673 A1 19971212; FR 2749673 B1 19980731; HU 0002137 A2 20001028; HU 0002137 A3 20030328; JP 2000512033 A 20000912; JP 3416148 B2 20030616; KR 20000016583 A 20000325; US 6107010 A 20000822

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-12-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GEMALTO SA, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69701468

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111006

2011-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69701468

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

- Effective date: 20111006

2011-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69701468

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20111006

2011-07-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110616 AND 20110622

2011-03-09 [REG GB S117] CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: S117

- Free Format Text: REQUEST FILED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 26 APRIL 2010

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2002-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2001-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GEMPLUS S.C.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2147003

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-06-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PORTA CHECCACCI & ASSOCIATI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701468

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-20

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 190735

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990713

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990111

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT