Global Patent Index - EP 0912971 B1

EP 0912971 B1 2001-05-09 - DISPLAY DEVICE WITH SEVERAL LIGHT SOURCES AND ARRANGEMENT OF DISPLAY DEVICES

Title (en)

DISPLAY DEVICE WITH SEVERAL LIGHT SOURCES AND ARRANGEMENT OF DISPLAY DEVICES

Title (de)

ANZEIGEEINRICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN LICHTQUELLEN UND ANORDNUNG VON ANZEIGEEINRICHTUNGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE A PLUSIEURS SOURCES DE LUMIERE ET AGENCEMENT DE DISPOSITIFS D'AFFICHAGE

Publication

EP 0912971 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97934529 A

Priority

  • DE 19630011 A
  • EP 9704003 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9805023A1] A process is disclosed for generating a display by using individually controllable light sources, as well as a display device with several light sources. A process for generating a display uses multiple individually controllable light sources which can be excited to light up by a control unit. This type of display was generally used until now for publicity purposes or in apparatuses. The light sources form a chain of light sources or several light sources are arranged in a matrix. Information is displayed in that all light sources are excited to light up, in the case of a chain of light sources, or in that part of the light sources is excited to light up, in the case of a matrix of light sources. The object of the invention is to provide a display with as few as possible light sources, while avoiding the above-mentioned problems, and which allows the representation of all alphanumeric signs, as well as other types of signs. This problem is solved by a process for generating a display which uses multiple individually controllable light sources which can be excited to light up by a control unit. The light sources are moved back and forth several times per unit of time over a surface and during that time individual or several light sources are excited to light up when they pass by a determined point. The surface covered by the light sources forms part of or the entire display surface. Advantageous developments of the process are described in dependent claims 2 and 3.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09F 19/12 (2006.01); G09G 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/005 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 5302965 A 19940412 - BELCHER BARRY J [GB], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29619984 U1 19971204; EP 0912971 A1 19990506; EP 0912971 B1 20010509; JP 2000515990 A 20001128; US 2002021262 A1 20020221; US 6433761 B1 20020813; WO 9805023 A1 19980205

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140724

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703514

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140724

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703514

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-09-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-05-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090430 AND 20090506

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703514 20010613

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991014

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990225

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB