Global Patent Index - EP 0912974 B1

EP 0912974 B1 2000-04-12 - METHOD OF REDUCING VOICE SIGNAL INTERFERENCE

Title (en)

METHOD OF REDUCING VOICE SIGNAL INTERFERENCE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON STÖRUNGEN EINES SPRACHSIGNALS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR REDUIRE LES PARASITES DANS UN SIGNAL VOCAL

Publication

EP 0912974 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97930489 A

Priority

  • DE 19629132 A
  • EP 9703482 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19629132A1] The invention concerns a method of reducing voice signal interference using a noise-reducing method. According to the invention, a masking curve is determined both for the input signal and the output signal of the noise reduction. By comparing the signal portions exceeding the respective masking curve, newly audible portions can be detected in the form of interference in the output signal, according to the type of musical tone, and subsequently damped selectively.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 21/02; G10L 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 15/20 (2006.01); G10L 13/00 (2006.01); G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); H04M 1/74 (2006.01); G10L 21/0264 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 21/0264 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19629132 A1 19980122; AT 191806 T 20000415; CA 2260893 A1 19980129; CA 2260893 C 20050517; EP 0912974 A1 19990506; EP 0912974 B1 20000412; ES 2146107 T3 20000716; JP 2002509620 A 20020326; JP 4187795 B2 20081126; US 6687669 B1 20040203; WO 9803965 A1 19980129

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-10-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: NUANCE COMMUNICATIONS, INC., US

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20120924

2012-05-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NUANCE COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (N.D.GES.D. STAATE, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59701446

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-05-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59701446

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-05-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59701446

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-04-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59701446

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100703

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100702

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100702

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090721

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090728

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-12-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-07-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146107

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701446

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-18

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191806

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 10L 21/02 A, 7G 10L 11/00 B

2000-03-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990722

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981205

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI