Global Patent Index - EP 0912984 B1

EP 0912984 B1 2002-12-18 - ARC EXTINGUISHING CHAMBER FOR LOW VOLTAGE POWER SWITCHES

Title (en)

ARC EXTINGUISHING CHAMBER FOR LOW VOLTAGE POWER SWITCHES

Title (de)

LICHTBOGENLÖSCHKAMMER FÜR NIEDERSPANNUNGS-LEISTUNGSSCHALTER

Title (fr)

CHAMBRE D'EXTINCTEUR D'ARC POUR SECTIONNEURS DE PUISSANCE BASSE TENSION

Publication

EP 0912984 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97933632 A

Priority

  • DE 9701474 W
  • DE 29612636 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9802893A1] An arc extinguishing chamber for low voltage power switches has a housing (1) and a lid (10) detachably secured to the housing (1) by fastening elements. The housing (1) has a shoulder (8) opposite to a hollow projection (3) and which can be gripped by a claw-like projection (9) of the lid (10). In another embodiment of the fastening system of the lid (10), lateral shoulder-like strips (14, 15) are provided on the housing (1) and projections (16, 17) are provided on both sides of the lid (10) for gripping the shoulders (14, 15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/345 (2013.01); H01H 2009/347 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29612636 U1 19970814; EP 0912984 A1 19990506; EP 0912984 B1 20021218; JP 2000514596 A 20001031; US 6222146 B1 20010424; WO 9802893 A1 19980122

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080709

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070919

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59709020 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59709020 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020626

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990115

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT