Global Patent Index - EP 0912986 B1

EP 0912986 B1 2000-02-02 - KINEMATIC DEVICE FOR ACTUATING THE MOVING CONTACT, PARTICULARLY FOR AUTOMATIC ELECTRIC BREAKERS

Title (en)

KINEMATIC DEVICE FOR ACTUATING THE MOVING CONTACT, PARTICULARLY FOR AUTOMATIC ELECTRIC BREAKERS

Title (de)

KINEMATISCHE ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN BEWEGBAREN SCHALTKONTAKT, INSBESONDERE FÜR SCHUTZSCHALTER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF CINEMATIQUE D'ACTIONNEMENT DU CONTACT MOBILE, NOTAMMENT DANS DES DISJONCTEURS AUTOMATIQUES

Publication

EP 0912986 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97939997 A

Priority

  • EP 9703770 W
  • IT MI961462 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9802897A1] A kinematic device for actuating the moving contact, particularly for automatic electric breakers, includes inside a box-like body, a motion lever (2) which is connected to a lever (10) for actuating the breaker and is pivoted to the box-like body by means of a first pivot (3). The motion lever (2) is articulated to linkages (11) which are pivoted, at the other end, to the first end (12) of a cross-member (13) which is operatively associated with a moving contact (15). The first end (12) of the cross-member (13) slidingly engages an engagement lever (21) which is pivoted to the box-like body by means of a second pivot (22) and is provided with a locking arm (30) of a control part (31) which is pivoted to the box-like body by means of a third pivot (32). The third pivot (32) constitutes the fulcrum of the moving contact (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/52; H01H 71/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/10 (2006.01); H01H 71/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/52 (2013.01); H01H 71/1027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9802897 A1 19980122; AT 189557 T 20000215; AU 4201297 A 19980209; DE 69701264 D1 20000309; DE 69701264 T2 20000608; EP 0912986 A1 19990506; EP 0912986 B1 20000202; IT 1283161 B1 19980407; IT MI961462 A1 19980115; IT MI961462 D0 19960715

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-15 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69701264

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-03-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010715

2001-07-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010715

2001-05-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-07-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000715

2000-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-05-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-05-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-04-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701264 20000309

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19990211;RO PAYMENT 19990211;SI PAYMENT 19990211

2000-02-02 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2000-02-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189557 T 20000215

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990526

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990211

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19990211;RO PAYMENT 19990211;SI PAYMENT 19990211