Global patent index - EP 0913140 A3

EP 0913140 A3 2000-01-19 - Auxiliary element for crutches

Title (en)

Auxiliary element for crutches

Title (de)

Hilfselement für Krücken

Title (fr)

Elément auxiliaire pour bequilles

Publication

EP 0913140 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98110924 A

Priority

DE 29719490 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913140A2] Crutch (38) is suspended on a support with an elastic section (14), passing over the shoulder or neck of the user and having a detachable attachment for the crutch. Preferably there are two attachments (26,30) which support crutches at points spaced from each other. The support is preferably in the form of a belt which passes along the crutch handle and holds it vertical. The attachment may pass under the handle (40) and/or the lower arm side guide members (46). The elastic section is preferably of a woven material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 3/02 (2006.01); A61H 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 3/0244 (2013.01); A61H 2003/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29719490 U1 19971218; EP 0913140 A2 19990506; EP 0913140 A3 20000119

INPADOC legal status

2001-04-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000720

2001-01-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEHBAUER, GERTRAUD

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GEHBAUER, GERTRAUD

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI