Global Patent Index - EP 0913170 A3

EP 0913170 A3 2000-03-08 - Protective jacket

Title (en)

Protective jacket

Title (de)

Schutzjacke

Title (fr)

Veste de protection

Publication

EP 0913170 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120168 A

Priority

AT 183597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913170A2] The protective jacket is made of a top fabric (16) connected to a lining (17). The top fabric (16) consists of at least one carrier layer, and the lining of at least two layers. The carrier layer and the lining layers are made of flame retardant material. A ventilation membrane is applied on the carrier layer surface facing the inner lining (17), preferably by lamination.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 17/00; A41D 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 31/00 (2006.01); A62B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 31/0027 (2013.01); A62B 17/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0913170 A2 19990506; EP 0913170 A3 20000308

INPADOC legal status


2001-06-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-05-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000909

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 62B 17/00 A, 7A 41D 31/00 B

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI