Global Patent Index - EP 0913188 A3

EP 0913188 A3 2000-04-26 - Double boiler with impeller for the production of a gaseous mixture

Title (en)

Double boiler with impeller for the production of a gaseous mixture

Title (de)

Doppelkessel mit Flügelrad zur Erzeugung eines Gasgemischs

Title (fr)

Chaudière double avec une palette d'agitation pour mélanger des gaz

Publication

EP 0913188 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120305 A

Priority

DE 29719197 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913188A2] A gas mixing vessel basically consists of two superimposed tanks with a rotating paddle wheel in the upper section. The dual tank is assembled from a number of components; (b) the basic upper tank section (1) has a flat surface (3) which is closed by an overhead cover plate (2) and seal; (c) a paddle wheel (14) rotates horizontally within the upper tank section (1) turned by a motor (21); (d) the motor (21) is linked to the paddle wheel (14) by a drive shaft (17); (e) the drive shaft (17) ends in the overhead cover plate (2) where it rests in a bearing, and has an intermediate bearing in the lower cover plate (11); (f) the lower cover plate (11) is secured to the lower part (6) of the dual tank by sealing surfaces (10,12); (g) different gases are introduced to the gas vessels via inlets (13) drilled in the lower cover plate (11); (g) the incoming gases enter the lower tank together with a carrier gas at increased pressure, and rise through a constriction (15) and inwards-directed passage (9) towards the rotating paddle wheel (14); (h) the gases are mixed by the paddle wheel and migrate into the free space (16) above the wheel; (i) mixed gases are discharged through outlets (18) in the upper plate (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 7/00; B01F 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29719197 U1 19980129; EP 0913188 A2 19990506; EP 0913188 A3 20000426

INPADOC legal status


2001-02-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-02-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20001212

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 01F 7/00 A, 7B 01F 7/22 B

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI