Global patent index - EP 0913189 A3

EP 0913189 A3 2000-10-25 - Mixer and crusher and method for using same for waste material, particularly biodegradable waste

Title (en)

Mixer and crusher and method for using same for waste material, particularly biodegradable waste

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Mischers und Zerkleinerers für Abfälle, insbesondere für biologisch abbaubare Abfälle und ein nach dem Verfahren arbeitender Zerkleinerer und Mischer

Title (fr)

Mélangeur-broyeur et méthode d'utilisation de ce dispositif pour des matériaux déchets, particulièrement pour des matériaux déchets biodégradables

Publication

EP 0913189 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120709 A

Priority

DE 19748206 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913189A2] Operating a mixing and reducing unit for waste comprises using an arrangement of advancing worms in a housing. The advancing worms of each container are driven in the same direction during the filling and mixing phase. In the second phase (delivery phase) the rotational direction of all the advancing worms (6, 12; 7, 13) is changed w.r.t. the rotational direction of the mixing unit and the advancing stream of the worm near the base of the unit is directed to the end outlet (39).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 7/08; B01F 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/08 (2006.01); B01F 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/027 (2013.01); B01F 7/081 (2013.01); B01F 7/088 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0913189 A2 19990506; EP 0913189 A3 20001025; DE 19748206 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status

2002-03-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 01F 7/08 A, 7B 01F 15/02 B

2000-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VKW ANLAGENBAU UND UMWELTTECHNIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI