Global Patent Index - EP 0913211 A3

EP 0913211 A3 2001-05-30 - Method and device for reducing the wall thickness of a hollow block

Title (en)

Method and device for reducing the wall thickness of a hollow block

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verringern der Wanddicke eines Hohlblocks

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour réduire l'épaisseur de la paroi d'un bloc creux

Publication

EP 0913211 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98250360 A

Priority

DE 19748920 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913211A2] To reduce the wall thickness of the end (1) of a hollow block, to be inserted into a rotary piercing mill, the end of the block to be inserted is drawn over a mandrel (4) before it reaches the rotary piercing mill using a roller cage similar to a push bench assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 19/06; B21C 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 1/24 (2006.01); B21C 37/16 (2006.01); B21B 15/00 (2006.01); B21B 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/16 (2013.01); B21C 1/24 (2013.01); B21B 19/06 (2013.01); B21B 2015/0028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0913211 A2 19990506; EP 0913211 A3 20010530; DE 19748920 A1 19990512; DE 19748920 C2 20031009

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040310

2003-11-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR REDUCING THE WALL THICKNESS OF A HOLLOW BLOCK

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030424

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI