Global Patent Index - EP 0913334 A4

EP 0913334 A4 2000-07-26 - SYNTHETIC RESIN CONTAINER LID HAVING TAMPER EVIDENT CHARACTERISTICS

Title (en)

SYNTHETIC RESIN CONTAINER LID HAVING TAMPER EVIDENT CHARACTERISTICS

Title (de)

KUNSTHARZ-BEHÄLTERDECKEL MIT GARANTIEEIGENSCHAFTEN

Title (fr)

COUVERCLE DE RECIPIENT INVIOLABLE EN RESINE SYNTHETIQUE

Publication

EP 0913334 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97949113 A

Priority

  • JP 9704649 W
  • JP 33618896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913334A1] A plastic container closure having tamper evident properties of a type in which axial breakage means disposed in a tamper evident bottom portion is constituted from a slit continuously extending from the upper end of the tamper evident bottom portion substantially to its lower end. A first high strength bridging portion is disposed on one circumferential side of an upper end of the axial breakage means, while a second high strength bridging portion is disposed on the other circumferential side of the upper end of the axial breakage means, whereby when the container closure is mounted on a mouth-and-neck portion of a container, the tamper evident bottom portion is prevented from being enlarged at a site where its axial breakage means exists. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/34 (2006.01); B65D 49/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/3409 (2013.01); B65D 41/3428 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0046 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0053 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0913334 A1 19990506; EP 0913334 A4 20000726; EP 0913334 B1 20031210; CN 1106329 C 20030423; CN 1213348 A 19990407; DE 69726735 D1 20040122; DE 69726735 T2 20041021; JP 3847868 B2 20061122; JP H10175656 A 19980630; WO 9826991 A1 19980625

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151217

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151217

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69726735

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141209

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69726735 P 20040122

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020830

2000-07-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980904

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB