Global Patent Index - EP 0913424 A3

EP 0913424 A3 2000-02-23 - Coated expansible styrene particles

Title (en)

Coated expansible styrene particles

Title (de)

Beschichtete expandierbare Polystyrolpartikel

Title (fr)

Perles styréniques expansibles recouvertes

Publication

EP 0913424 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118982 A

Priority

DE 19747539 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913424A2] Expandable polystyrene particles (I) containing a blowing agent have a diameter of 0.35-3 mm and are coated with 0.005 to less than 0.5 wt.% of a hydrophobic agent (II) that melts above 10 degrees C. (II) is a carboxylate of aluminum, zirconium or hafnium. Independent claims are included for (i) the production of (I) by treatment of expandable polystyrene particles with an aqueous solution containing 5-50 wt.% (II) or by coating the expandable polystyrene particles with solid (II) that has been adsorbed onto fine particulate silicic acid; (ii) the production of expanded polystyrene particles by foaming (I) or by coating expanded polystyrene particles with 0.005 to less than 5 wt.% (II); and (iii) expanded polystyrene particles prepared from (I).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08J 9/224; C08J 9/228

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 9/224 (2006.01); C08K 5/098 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08J 9/224 (2013.01); C08K 5/098 (2013.01); C08J 2325/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08K 5/098 + C08L 25/06

Citation (search report)

  • [AD] EP 0449065 A2 19911002 - BASF AG [DE]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 166 (P - 1713) 18 March 1994 (1994-03-18)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19747539 A1 19990429; EP 0913424 A2 19990506; EP 0913424 A3 20000223; EP 0913424 B1 20041201; ES 2231935 T3 20050516

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812324

- Effective date: 20140501

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071008

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071008

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071008

2008-06-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-11-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061004

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-06-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2231935 T3

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812324 P 20050105

2004-12-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-02-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040105

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI