Global Patent Index - EP 0913511 A3

EP 0913511 A3 2000-03-15 - Apparatus for recovering thread loops in warping machines

Title (en)

Apparatus for recovering thread loops in warping machines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Rückgewinnung einer Fadenschleife in Schärmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour récupérer une boucle de fil dans les ourdissoirs

Publication

EP 0913511 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98830624 A

Priority

IT FI970242 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913511A2] System for recovering thread loops in warping machines with a support for winding up the thread in a preset sequence and with means for presenting and releasing the same threads, the apparatus comprising a fixed structure (1) located between a warper and a creel on which reels are provided for feeding the threads (F, G, H, ...., Z) to the warper (2), wherein to said structure (1) means are associated which impart an impulse, from above downwards, to the thread each time disengaged by the release members (21) of the warper (2): said means acting upon the portion of thread between the structure (1) and the warper (2) and being connected to the release members (2) so that the impulse is imparted simultaneously to the release of the thread. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02H 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02H 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02H 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0913511 A2 19990506; EP 0913511 A3 20000315; EP 0913511 B1 20040218; DE 69821706 D1 20040325; DE 69821706 T2 20041125; IT 1298653 B1 20000112; IT FI970242 A1 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040718

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-06-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041019

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2005-02-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-10-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041019

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69821706 P 20040325

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT PT

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI