Global Patent Index - EP 0913537 A3

EP 0913537 A3 2000-03-22 - Flooring structure

Title (en)

Flooring structure

Title (de)

Bodenstruktur

Title (fr)

Structure de plancher

Publication

EP 0913537 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98308877 A

Priority

  • GB 9722911 A
  • GB 9802462 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913537A2] A flooring structure comprises beams (1) of box or inverted channel section, thermally insulating material (4) supported between adjacent beams (1), and decking (5) supported by the beams (1). Also described are forms of beam (1) suitable for use in the flooring structure and methods of constructing the flooring structure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/02; E04B 5/10; E04C 3/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/29 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0913537 A2 19990506; EP 0913537 A3 20000322

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000923

2001-01-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI