Global patent index - EP 0913538 A3

EP 0913538 A3 2001-04-04 - Device for the tensioning without bonding of building constructions

Title (en)

Device for the tensioning without bonding of building constructions

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Vorspannung von Bauwerken ohne Verbund

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mise en tension sans adhérence d'ouvrages

Publication

EP 0913538 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120463 A

Priority

DE 19748960 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913538A2] The sheath (4) of at least one of the tensioning elements (2) is provided with a means of fixing the sheath in relation to the supporting framework (5) and/or in relation to the sheathing of the remaining tension members, the retaining means cooperating with additional joining devices. All tension members pass through a jacket tube (8) which is fixed in relation to the supporting framework.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/08; E04C 5/10; E04C 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/08 (2006.01); E04C 5/10 (2006.01); E04C 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/12 (2013.01); E04C 5/08 (2013.01); E04C 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0913538 A2 19990506; EP 0913538 A3 20010404

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010105

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI