Global patent index - EP 0913565 A3

EP 0913565 A3 2001-02-28 - Apparatus for controlling engine torque in a vehicle

Title (en)

Apparatus for controlling engine torque in a vehicle

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Regelung des Antriebsmomentes einer Brennkraftmaschine eines Kraftfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour commander le couple moteur d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 0913565 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98120509 A

Priority

JP 29869997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913565A2] An apparatus for controlling the torque of an engine (2) of a vehicle. The vehicle has a drive train for transmitting power of the engine (2) to a driving wheel (W). An electronic control unit (ECU)(71) corrects the fuel injection amount based on the fluctuation of the engine speed to reduce torsional vibration of the drive train. The engine torque is regulated through the correction of the fuel injection amount to reduce the torsional vibration. The ECU (71) does not correct the fuel injection amount when the engine speed is below a predetermined lower limit. The lower limit is different for each shift position of the transmission (36), so that the torsional vibration is accurately reduced in any shift position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14; F02D 35/00; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 29/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/12 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1497 (2013.01); F02D 41/0225 (2013.01); F02D 41/10 (2013.01); F02D 41/12 (2013.01); F02D 41/408 (2013.01); F02D 2200/501 (2013.01); F02D 2250/18 (2013.01); F02D 2250/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0768455 A2 19970416 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]
  • [A] WO 8907709 A1 19890824 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]
  • [YD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 04 30 April 1996 (1996-04-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 044 (M - 1547) 24 January 1994 (1994-01-24)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0913565 A2 19990506; EP 0913565 A3 20010228; EP 0913565 B1 20040929; DE 69826607 D1 20041104; DE 69826607 T2 20060223; JP 3500935 B2 20040223; JP H11132069 A 19990518

INPADOC legal status

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091029

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-05-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69826607

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030623

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981029

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI