Global Patent Index - EP 0913625 A3

EP 0913625 A3 2000-11-02 - Signalling light

Title (en)

Signalling light

Title (de)

Signalleuchte

Title (fr)

Lampe de signalisation

Publication

EP 0913625 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119924 A

Priority

DE 29719399 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913625A2] Signal lamp (100), with a lamp, has a body composed of at least two module bodies (10, 12, 14, 16, 18) bonded together with a release mounting. The module bodies (12, 14, 16, 18) are held together by a plug or screw attachment. The module bodies (12, 14, 16, 18) are glass or plastics, and especially polycarbonate or polyacrylonitrile butadiene styrene (ABS). The foot stand (20) is fine steel. At least one module body can contain a sound unit with or instead of the inner lamp.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21Q 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2013.01); F21W 2111/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29719399 U1 19980806; EP 0913625 A2 19990506; EP 0913625 A3 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070821

2007-06-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21S 8/00 20060101AFI20070504BHEP

2007-06-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21S 2/00 20060101ALI20070504BHEP

2007-06-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21W 131/10 20060101ALI20070504BHEP

2007-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060424

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PFANNENBERG GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES IT LI

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001028

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI