Global Patent Index - EP 0913627 A3

EP 0913627 A3 2001-01-10 - Mounting device for recessed apparatus

Title (en)

Mounting device for recessed apparatus

Title (de)

Aufnahmevorrichtung für Einbauten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation pour appareils encastrés

Publication

EP 0913627 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120395 A

Priority

DE 19747467 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913627A2] The reception housing (18) is fitted into an opening in a wall or ceiling surface, or in a furniture panel, for providing a dished reception space (6) for the built-in light, with at least one spring element (3) secured to the rear wall (11) of the housing, with spring sections (4) projecting outwards from the housing for engaging the edge of the opening at the rear.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/02 (2006.01); F21V 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/02 (2013.01); F21V 21/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0913627 A2 19990506; EP 0913627 A3 20010110; DE 19747467 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020501

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK LI LU NL

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010324

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK LI LU NL

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI