Global Patent Index - EP 0913634 A3

EP 0913634 A3 2000-02-09 - Gas burner

Title (en)

Gas burner

Title (de)

Gasbrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur à gaz

Publication

EP 0913634 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120066 A

Priority

DE 19747481 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913634A2] The gas burner has burner body and a base section. The base section (50) is connected to the burner casing by at least one quick connector lock (60). The gas ducts are accessible to allow separation of the gas feed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/78; F23D 14/04; F23D 14/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/46 (2006.01); F23D 14/78 (2006.01); F24H 9/18 (2006.01); F24H 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/78 (2013.01); F23D 14/045 (2013.01); F23D 14/46 (2013.01); F24H 9/1836 (2013.01); F24H 1/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19747481 C1 19990429; AT 263336 T 20040415; EP 0913634 A2 19990506; EP 0913634 A3 20000209; EP 0913634 B1 20040331

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121023

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111103

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101023

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041023

2004-09-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811089 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021107

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 23D 14/78 A, 7F 23D 14/04 B, 7F 23D 14/46 B

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI