Global Patent Index - EP 0913639 B1

EP 0913639 B1 2002-12-04 - Apparatus and method for burning combustible gases

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for burning combustible gases

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Brennen von brennbaren Gasen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour brûler des gaz combustibles

Publication

EP 0913639 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99100417 A

Priority

  • EP 94912778 A
  • GB 9305820 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9421967A1] An apparatus for burning the combustible components of a gas stream. The apparatus comprises a stack pipe (4, 10) having one end in communication with a gas supply pipe (2) for receiving a gas stream; means (5) for introducing air into the stack pipe to produce an air and gas mixture; a mixing zone (6); means (14) for igniting the air and gas mixture; means (8) for stabilizing; and means (12) located at the other end of the stack pipe for inhibiting downwash. Also disclosed is a method for burning the combustible components of a gas stream utilizing the apparatus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 7/08; F23D 14/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/06 (2006.01); F23G 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/085 (2013.01); F23C 2202/40 (2013.01); F23D 2207/00 (2013.01); F23D 2209/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9421967 A1 19940929; AU 6519194 A 19941011; AU 686151 B2 19980205; BR 9406185 A 19960206; CA 2158560 A1 19940929; CN 1110648 C 20030604; CN 1122629 A 19960515; CZ 290561 B6 20020814; CZ 9502432 A3 19960313; DE 69419737 D1 19990902; DE 69904244 D1 20030116; EP 0688414 A1 19951227; EP 0688414 B1 19990728; EP 0913639 A2 19990506; EP 0913639 A3 19990811; EP 0913639 B1 20021204; ES 2133550 T3 19990916; GB 9305820 D0 19930505; HK 1015166 A1 20000922; HK 1024943 A1 20031121; JP H08507852 A 19960820; PT 913639 E 20030430; TW 240282 B 19950211

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040314

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050314

2005-03-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050314

2004-11-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-10-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-02-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040205

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-10-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-03-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-03-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904244 20030116

2002-12-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 688414

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020225

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CABOT CORPORATION

2000-05-24 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19990811

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990204

1999-05-06 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 688414

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT