Global patent index - EP 0913640 A3

EP 0913640 A3 2000-05-03 - Combustion chamber for gas burner from a water heater and a heating apparatus

Title (en)

Combustion chamber for gas burner from a water heater and a heating apparatus

Title (de)

Brennkammer, insbesondere für Gas-Warmwasserbereiter- und Gas-Heizungsgerätebrenner

Title (fr)

Chambre de combustion pour un brûleur à gaz d'un chauffe-eau et d'un appareil de chauffage

Publication

EP 0913640 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119352 A

Priority

DE 19748260 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913640A2] A combustion chamber (4) has a temperature resistant wall (1) of a low thermal conductivity self-supporting ceramic heat insulating plate (10) coated with an IR reflective layer (12) on its interior wall surface (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23M 5/00 (2006.01); F23M 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23M 5/00 (2013.01); F23M 5/085 (2013.01); F23M 2900/05004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0913640 A2 19990506; EP 0913640 A3 20000503; DE 19748260 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030116

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI