Global Patent Index - EP 0913646 B1

EP 0913646 B1 2001-12-19 - Cooking oven with cooled lighting device

Title (en)

Cooking oven with cooled lighting device

Title (de)

Herd mit gekühlter Beleuchtungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Cuisinière à dispositif d'éclairage refroidi

Publication

EP 0913646 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98120424 A

Priority

DE 19748002 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913646A1] In the lamp fixture is held with a socket. Above the oven muffle between a blow-out aperture of a cooling blower and an air outlet aperture issuing in to the atmosphere is a blower shaft. A part of the air blown out of the blow-out aperture of the cooling blower (13) is directed on to the lamp fixture (31) and the socket for cooling purposes. The roasting oven light (28) is spaced from the blower shaft (9). On the blower shaft or the cooling blower a cooling hose (25) is connected, the end section of which is directed on to the lamp fixture and the socket.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/008 (2013.01); F24C 15/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0913646 A1 19990506; EP 0913646 B1 20011219; DE 19748002 A1 19990506; PL 188496 B1 20050228; PL 329399 A1 19990510

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061020

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-15 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070522

2006-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MIELE & CIE. GMBH & CO. SCHUTZRECHTE/VERTRAEGE

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802517 20020131

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL SE

2001-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT NL SE

1999-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990902

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL SE

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI