Global Patent Index - EP 0913647 A3

EP 0913647 A3 2000-03-08 - Stoves

Title (en)

Stoves

Title (de)

Öfen

Title (fr)

Fours

Publication

EP 0913647 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98308801 A

Priority

GB 9722631 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913647A2] A stove (10) includes a housing in the form of a sealed unit. The interior of the housing contains a burner assembly (23) and an internal baffle (14) which is located to the rear of the burner assembly (23) and extends downwardly and rearwardly with its lower end spaced from the rear (19) and the base (18) of the housing. A flue (11) extends from the housing and includes a first passageway (22) for the discharge of the products of combustion from that part of the interior of the housing in front of the baffle (14) and a second passageway (24) for the supply of air to that part of the interior of the housing to the rear of the baffle (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/00; F23J 13/02; F23L 17/04; F24C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0913647 A2 19990506; EP 0913647 A3 20000308; GB 2330902 A 19990505; GB 9722631 D0 19971224; GB 9823367 D0 19981223

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-05-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000909

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 24C 15/00 A, 7F 24C 3/00 B, 7F 23J 13/02 B, 7F 23L 17/04 B

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI