Global Patent Index - EP 0913886 A3

EP 0913886 A3 2001-01-03 - Miniaturized female terminal

Title (en)

Miniaturized female terminal

Title (de)

Miniaturisiertes Steckkontaktelement

Title (fr)

Borne femelle miniaturisée

Publication

EP 0913886 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119462 A

Priority

DE 29719153 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913886A2] A base area (5) next to a contact area (4) has a level bottom wall (7) and side walls vertical to it. Fixed to the bottom wall's entering edges (31, 34) are spring contact arms (37, 38) slightly narrower than the bottom wall and the top wall. These arms protrude, tapering inwards to a contact line (40). Their open ends (41, 42) veer outwards from the contact line and form a funnel (45).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/18 (2006.01); H01R 4/18 (2006.01); H01R 13/03 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/18 (2013.01); H01R 4/185 (2013.01); H01R 13/03 (2013.01); H01R 13/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29719153 U1 19990304; EP 0913886 A2 19990506; EP 0913886 A3 20010103; EP 0913886 B1 20030611; ES 2201389 T3 20040316; US 6126495 A 20001003

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051017

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2005-10-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051017

2005-10-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051015

2004-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041029

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041029

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2201389

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808684

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010623

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI